Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU619581B | Global Dossier | 30.01.1992 | B2 | AU4000189 | 21.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8811085 | 22.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0356329 | Global Dossier | 23.07.1997 | B2 | EP0356329 | 10.11.1993 | B1 | EP0356329 | 28.02.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8811085 | 22.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2045503T | 16.10.1997 | T5 | ES2045503T | 16.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR8811085 | 22.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2635615 | 09.11.1990 | B1 | FR2635615 | 23.02.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8811085 | 22.08.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4964813 | 23.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8811085 | 22.08.1988 |