EP0356329 - Tapping assembly for a secondary cable to be connected to a main uninterrupted cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1997 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S I C A M E SOCIETE INDUSTRIELLE DE CONSTRUCTION D'APPAREILS ET DE MATERIEL ELECTRIQUE F-19230 Arnac Pompadour / FR | [1990/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Francois, Pierre 12 Rue Léon Sazerat F-87000 Limoges / FR | 02 /
Prodel, Michel Henri Marie François Troche F-19230 Arnac Pompadour / FR | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89402312.6 | 21.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | FR19880011085 | 22.08.1988 Original published format: FR 8811085 | [1990/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356329 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356329 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0356329 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/03, H01R4/24 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H01R9/03 (EP,US);
H01R4/2408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Abzweigungseinrichtung für die Verbindung eines Nebenkabels an ein durchgehendes Hauptkabel | [1990/09] | English: | Tapping assembly for a secondary cable to be connected to a main uninterrupted cable | [1990/09] | French: | Accessoire de branchement pour câble dérivé à relier à un câble principal passant | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.07.1994
11.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Karl Pfisterer Elektrotechnische Spezialartikel GmbH & Co. KG Inselstrasse 140 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Held, Martin Patentanwälte Phys. H. Bartels, Dipl.-Ing H. Fink Dr.-Ing. M. Held, Dipl.-Ing. M. Bartels Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.07.1994
11.08.1994
ADMISSIBLE Karl Pfisterer Elektrotechnische Spezialartikel GmbH & Co. KG Inselstrasse 140 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Held, Martin, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Phys. H. Bartels, Dipl.-Ing H. Fink Dr.-Ing. M. Held, Dipl.-Ing. M. Bartels Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | 14.09.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.01.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.12.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.04.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0239428 (VERLANT ET BEAURAIN [FR]); | [A]FR2394902 (AMP INC [US]) |