Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0363247


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.04.1994 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.06.1994 [1994/24]
07.05.1993 (Expected) grant published on  23.06.1993 [1993/25]
27.05.1992 First examination report
24.02.1990 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.04.1990 [1990/15]
24.02.1990 Request for examination filed published on  11.04.1990 [1990/15]