blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0363247

EP0363247 - Apparatus for positioning and withdrawing a plasma arc torch in an installation working at such a pressure and temperature that a direct intervention is impossible [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.04.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.06.1994 [1994/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE, Société Anonyme
37, Boulevard de Montmorency
75781 Paris Cedex 16 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/15]For all designated states
AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE Société Anonyme dite:
37, Boulevard de Montmorency
F-75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Feuillerat, Jean
19 rue du Lavoir
F-33000 Bordeaux / FR
02 / Jouanno, Jean
Résidence Parc de Tassigny Rue de la Cage Verte
F-33200 Bordeaux Cauderan / FR
03 / Valy, Yves Hervé Guillaume
41 rue Edouard Branly Les Artigous Issac
F-33160 Saint-Médard-en-Jalles / FR
[1990/15]
Representative(s)Barnay, André François
Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171
75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/15]Barnay, André François
Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171
F-75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR
Application number, filing date89402601.222.09.1989
[1990/15]
Priority number, dateFR1988001289803.10.1988         Original published format: FR 8812898
[1990/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0363247
Date:11.04.1990
Language:FR
[1990/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0363247
Date:23.06.1993
Language:FR
[1993/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1989
ClassificationIPC:C21B5/00
[1990/15]
CPC:
C21B5/002 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   SE [1990/15]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Anbringen und Entfernen eines Plasmabrenners in einen Apparat, der unter einem solchen Druck und einer solchen Temperatur arbeitet, dass direktes Arbeiten unmöglich ist[1990/15]
English:Apparatus for positioning and withdrawing a plasma arc torch in an installation working at such a pressure and temperature that a direct intervention is impossible[1990/15]
French:Dispositif pour la mise à poste et le retrait d'une torche à plasma sur un appareil fonctionnant sous pression et température interdisant une intervention directe[1990/15]
Examination procedure03.10.1989Examination requested  [1990/15]
03.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.1993Fee for grant paid
11.03.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2167843  (SKF STEEL ENG AB);
 [A]US4477248  (DULAC ROBERT R [US]);
 [A]US2924269  (GENOVESE CHARLES E);
 [A]US3749803  (CAMACHO S);
 [A]GB2166029  (SKF STEEL ENG AB)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.