blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0363260

EP0363260 - Tight dosing container for horticulture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF HORTICULTURE ET JARDIN S.A.
52, rue Kléber
92300 Levallois Perret / FR
[N/P]
Former [1990/15]For all designated states
BASF HORTICULTURE ET JARDIN S.A.
52, rue Kléber
F-92300 Levallois Perret / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Queste, Yves
32 bis, rue du Trouillet
F-91400 Argenteuil / FR
[1990/15]
Representative(s)Rodhain, Claude, et al
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]Rodhain, Claude, et al
Cabinet Claude Rodhain S.A. 3, rue Moncey
F-75009 Paris / FR
Former [1990/15]Kügele, Bernhard
NOVAPAT FRANCE 63 bis, boulevard Bessières
F-75017 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date89402686.329.09.1989
[1990/15]
Priority number, dateFR1988001291703.10.1988         Original published format: FR 8812917
FR1989000329114.03.1989         Original published format: FR 8903291
[1990/15]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0363260
Date:11.04.1990
Language:FR
[1990/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0363260
Date:26.05.1993
Language:FR
[1993/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:B65D83/06, A01C7/02, A01C15/02
[1990/15]
CPC:
A01C7/02 (EP); B65D83/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1990/15]
TitleGerman:Hermetisch verschlossener Dosierbehälter für den Gartenbau[1990/15]
English:Tight dosing container for horticulture[1990/15]
French:Conditionnement doseur étanche pour horticulture[1990/15]
Examination procedure17.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
18.11.1991Request for accelerated examination filed
17.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.1991Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.11.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.1993Fee for grant paid
08.02.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
15.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE26.05.1993
GB26.05.1993
GR26.05.1993
IT26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
LU30.09.1993
[2008/01]
Former [2000/04]DE26.05.1993
GB26.05.1993
GR26.05.1993
IT26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
LU30.09.1993
Former [1999/42]DE26.05.1993
GB26.05.1993
IT26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/31]DE26.05.1993
GB26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
CH30.09.1993
LI30.09.1993
Former [1994/22]DE26.05.1993
GB26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
Former [1994/03]DE26.05.1993
NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
Former [1994/02]NL26.05.1993
SE26.05.1993
Former [1994/01]NL26.05.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1365040  ;
 [A]US2906439  ;
 [A]DE1429235  ;
 [A]US3515314
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.