EP0370871 - Process for producing standard gas mixture and apparatus for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mettes, Jacques 5-9-9, Tokodai Toyosato-machi Tsucuba Gun Ibaraki-pref. 300-26 / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Takako 5-9-9, Tokodai Toyosato-machi Tsucuba Gun Ibaraki-pref. 300-26 / JP | 03 /
Schack, Michael, c/o Air Liquide GmbH Bereich Alphagaz, Konrad Adenauer-Platz 11 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | [1995/18] |
Former [1990/22] | 01 /
Mettes, Jacques 5-9-9, Tokodai Toyosato-machi Tsucuba Gun Ibaraki-pref. 300-26 / JP | ||
02 /
Kimura, Takako 5-9-9, Tokodai Toyosato-machi Tsucuba Gun Ibaraki-pref. 300-26 / JP | |||
03 /
Schack, Michael Konrad-Adenauer-Platz 11 c/o AIR LIQUIDE GMBH D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1990/22] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403154.1 | 17.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | EP19880402919 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: EP 88402919 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0370871 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370871 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
G01N33/0018 (EP,US);
B01F23/19 (EP,US);
G01N33/0006 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0352 (EP,US);
Y10T436/100833 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen eines Standardgasgemisches und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/22] | English: | Process for producing standard gas mixture and apparatus for producing the same | [1990/22] | French: | Procédé pour préparer un mélange standard de gaz, et appareil pour sa production | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 20.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.1995 | BE | 03.05.1995 | CH | 03.05.1995 | ES | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | SE | 03.08.1995 | LU | 30.11.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
LU | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60143738 ; | [Y]US3776023 (BUDD A, et al); | [A]US4114419 (KIMBELL CHARLES L); | [A]US4351743 (HASHIMOTO YOSHIKAZU) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 314 (P-412)[2037], 10th December 1985; & JP-A-60 143 738 (SHIMAZU SEISAKUSHO K.K.), & JP60143738 A 00000000 |