EP0376781 - Automatic testing station for chip-type electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES LCC 50, rue Jean -Pierre Timbaud B.P. 301 F-92402 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES LCC 50, rue Jean -Pierre Timbaud B.P. 301 F-92402 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mentzer, Régis THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Cavuoto, Roger THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 03 /
Espitalier, Chistian THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 04 /
Lanier, Daniel THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 05 /
Matiron, Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403436.2 | 12.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | FR19880016808 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816808 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376781 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G01R31/016 (EP);
G01R31/26 (KR);
H01L22/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur automatischen Kontrolle von chipartigen elektronischen Bauteilen | [1990/27] | English: | Automatic testing station for chip-type electronic components | [1990/27] | French: | Installation de contrôle automatique de composants électroniques du type chips | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/01] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, vol. 10, no. 2, juillet 1988, pages 147-153, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Holland), Amsterdam, NL; R. KRISHNAMOORTHY et al.: "Mu-processor based capacitor testing and sorting" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 14, no. 1, juin 1971, page 162; A. KOSTENKO et al.: "Gravity-feed loader for turntable" |