EP0378935 - Device to dispense a liquid or cream in droplets having small volumes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE TECHNIQUE DE PULVERISATION (S.T.E.P.) 10, rue Singer 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states SOCIETE TECHNIQUE DE PULVERISATION (S.T.E.P.) 10, rue Singer F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jouillat, Claude La Marette F-28270 Montigny sur Avre / FR | 02 /
Brunet, Michel La Marnière Carrée F-27840 Sainte Colombe la Commanderie / FR | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403473.5 | 13.12.1989 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | FR19880016867 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816867 | FR19890004538 | 06.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8904538 | [1990/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378935 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378935 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/18, F16K21/16 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
B05B11/0064 (EP,US);
A61F9/0008 (EP,US);
B05B11/00446 (EP,US);
B05B11/1054 (EP,US);
B05B11/109 (EP,US);
B05B11/1094 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spenden einer Flüssigkeit oder einer Creme in Tropfen kleinen Volumens | [1990/30] | English: | Device to dispense a liquid or cream in droplets having small volumes | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif pour distribuer un liquide ou un lait par goutte de petit volume et ensemble de distribution associée | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | 15.02.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.09.1992 | ES | 23.09.1992 | GR | 23.09.1992 | IT | 23.09.1992 | NL | 23.09.1992 | SE | 23.09.1992 | BE | 31.12.1992 | CH | 31.12.1992 | LI | 31.12.1992 | LU | 31.12.1992 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
ES | 23.09.1992 | ||
GR | 23.09.1992 | ||
IT | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
GR | 23.09.1992 | ||
IT | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
IT | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
IT | 23.09.1992 | ||
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 23.09.1992 | |
NL | 23.09.1992 | ||
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/03] | NL | 23.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
CH | 31.12.1992 | ||
LI | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/47] | NL | 23.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
BE | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | NL | 23.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/16] | SE | 23.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3164304 (NIEL JAGER HOLGER, et al) |