EP0375524 - Transfer system for producing underwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIIVAR ZAC DE PENESSUY 16, Avenue Pablo Picasso F-01000 Bourg en Bresse / FR | [1990/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Périllat, Jean-Guy Le Moulin de Brou 20, rue Jules Guérin F-01000 Bourg en Gresse / FR | 02 /
Flach, Olivier Chez Monsieur Jacquet Le Potey Meillonnas F-01370 St Etienne du Bois / FR | 03 /
Elouard, Christophe Le Hameau Marillat F-01440 Viriat / FR | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403508.8 | 15.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | FR19880016720 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8816720 | [1990/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375524 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D05B25/00, D05B35/10, D05B33/02 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
A41H42/00 (EP);
D05B33/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Transferstrasse zur Herstellung von Unterwäsche | [1990/26] | English: | Transfer system for producing underwear | [1990/26] | French: | Procédés de fabrication automatique de produits en feuilles souples constitués de plusieurs pièces assemblées tels que des vêtements ou sous-vêtements ainsi que dispositifs pour la mise en oeuvre de ces procédés | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/28] | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0152170 ; | [X]WO8704736 ; | [X]US3899986 ; | [A]FR2552744 ; | [A]EP0044766 ; | [A]US4292908 ; | [A]US2413891 ; | [X]FR2585683 ; | [X]DE2145816 ; | [A]GB2194725 ; | [A]GB2194724 ; | [A]WO8605466 ; | [A]US3203386 ; | [AD]GB2067511 ; | [A]US4370936 ; | [A]DE2142720 ; | [A]FR2558492 ; | [A]US3896749 |