EP0376852 - Microgranules essentially consisting of triglycerides of saturated fatty acids loaded with an active substance, and their topical therapeutical use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES GALDERMA - CIRD GALDERMA Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES GALDERMA - CIRD GALDERMA Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | ||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states CENTRE INTERNATIONAL DE RECHERCHES DERMATOLOGIQUES C.I.R.D. Groupement d'Intérêt Economique dit: Sophia Antipolis F-06560 Valbonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jamoulle, Jean-Claude 52, allée de la Grange F-06250 Mougins / FR | 02 /
Allec, Josiane Les Vergers de Val Constance 300, Chemin de la Suquette F-06600 Antibes / FR | 03 /
Brzokewicz, Alain Les Jonquilles Batiment 4 Les Semboules F-06600 Antibes / FR | 04 /
Shroot, Braham Villa 35 Hameaux de Val Bosquet Chemin de Val Bosquet F-06600 Antibes / FR | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89403675.5 | 28.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | LU19880087416 | 29.12.1988 Original published format: LU 87416 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376852 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376852 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K47/14 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/671 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Im wesentlichen aus Triglyceriden gesättigter Fettsäuren bestehende, mit einem Wirkstoff beladene Mikrogranulate und ihre äusserliche therapeutische Anwendung | [1990/27] | English: | Microgranules essentially consisting of triglycerides of saturated fatty acids loaded with an active substance, and their topical therapeutical use | [1990/27] | French: | Microgranulés chargés en une substance active, constitués essentiellement d'un triglycéride d'acides gras saturés et leur utilisation par voie topique dans le domaine thérapeutique | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.1993 | GR | 23.06.1993 | NL | 23.06.1993 | SE | 23.06.1993 | BE | 31.12.1993 | CH | 31.12.1993 | LI | 31.12.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1995/11] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
NL | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
BE | 31.12.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
NL | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
NL | 23.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 23.06.1993 | |
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | SE | 23.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB543309 (JOHN DAVID EVANS, et al); | [A]FR2218086 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [A]DE2725924 (HOBEG HOCHTEMPERATURREAKTOR) |