EP0329579 - Well for microbiological analysis or such [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO MERIEUX, Société anonyme F-69280 Marcy l'Etoile / FR | [1991/39] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states API SYSTEM S.A. La Balme Les Grottes F-38390 Montalieu-Vercieu / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monget, Daniel 24 Résidence du Moulin Saint-Sorlin-en-Bugey F-01150 Lagnieu / FR | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 20 Boulevard Eugène Deruelle BP 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | ||
Former [1989/34] | Maureau, Philippe Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU BP 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420054.2 | 15.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | FR19880002180 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: FR 8802180 | [1989/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0329579 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329579 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, C12M1/16 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP);
B01L2300/0822 (EP);
B01L2300/0858 (EP);
B01L3/50855 (EP);
B01L9/06 (EP);
C12M23/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/34] | Title | German: | Becher für mikrobiologische Untersuchungen oder ähnliches | [1989/34] | English: | Well for microbiological analysis or such | [1989/34] | French: | Cupule d'analyse microbiologique ou similaire | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.11.1993 | SE | 18.11.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/28] | SE | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3363503 (NORMAN SHIFRIN); | [X]US3713780 (SHAPIRO S); | [X]GB1493353 (DEVICES IMPLANTS LTD); | [X]EP0050018 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) |