EP0333602 - Textile structure for use in making laminated composites, and moulded laminated composites containing such a structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS LES FILS D'AUGUSTE CHOMARAT & CIE. Société Anonyme 7, rue Roy 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS LES FILS D'AUGUSTE CHOMARAT & CIE. Société Anonyme 7, rue Roy F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chomarat, Gilbert Route des Chavannes F-74260 Les Gets / FR | 02 /
Lenglart, Jacques 9 route de Saint Jean Roure F-07160 Le Cheylard / FR | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/38] | Laurent, Michel Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420075.7 | 28.02.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | FR19880003482 | 14.03.1988 Original published format: FR 8803482 | [1989/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0333602 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333602 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D04H13/00, B29C67/14 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
B29C70/08 (EP);
B29C70/467 (EP);
B29C70/543 (EP);
D04B21/165 (EP);
D04H1/4218 (EP);
D04H1/498 (EP);
D04H13/00 (EP);
B29K2105/0809 (EP);
B29K2105/0836 (EP);
B29K2105/0854 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Textile Struktur zur Herstellung von Schichtstoffen und Schichtformteile, die diese Struktur enthalten | [1989/38] | English: | Textile structure for use in making laminated composites, and moulded laminated composites containing such a structure | [1989/38] | French: | Armature textile utilisable pour la réalisation de complexes stratifiés et complexes stratifiés en forme comportant une telle armature | [1989/38] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 30.10.1991 | SE | 30.10.1991 | CH | 29.02.1992 | LI | 29.02.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [1993/01] | SE | 30.10.1991 | |
CH | 29.02.1992 | ||
LI | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/21] | SE | 30.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2048071 ; | [AD]US3044146 ; | [A]GB1370787 |