EP0341163 - Process for the preparation of cyclohexanol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blanchard, Gilbert 5, Allée des Acacias Lagny-le-Sec F-60330 Le Plessis Belleville / FR | 02 /
Costantini, Michel 10, rue du Docteur Bonhomme F-69003 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Lecomte, Jean-Pierre 24, rue Boileau F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1989/45] | Representative(s) | Vignally, Noel, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Vignally, Noel, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/45] | Varnière-Grange, Monique RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420154.0 | 27.04.1989 | [1989/45] | Priority number, date | FR19880006083 | 02.05.1988 Original published format: FR 8806083 | [1989/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0341163 | Date: | 08.11.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0341163 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/04, C07C35/08 | [1989/45] | CPC: |
C07C29/04 (EP,KR);
C07C35/08 (KR);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/04, C07C35/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/45] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von Cyclohexanol | [1989/45] | English: | Process for the preparation of cyclohexanol | [1989/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation du cyclohexanol | [1989/45] | Examination procedure | 24.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 18.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.1993
03.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Langfinger, Klaus Dieter BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.1993
03.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Langfinger, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 08.12.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.03.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 08.06.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 18.06.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.02.1993 | GR | 03.02.1993 | SE | 03.02.1993 | CH | 30.04.1993 | LI | 30.04.1993 | LU | 30.04.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 03.02.1993 | |
SE | 03.02.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | SE | 03.02.1993 | |
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 03.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3644497 (MESICH FRANK G); | [Y]EP0010993 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [XD]EP0224116 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |