EP0348306 - Machine for cabling threads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICBT LYON 2 avenue Barthélemy Thimonnier 69300 Caluire / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states ICBT LYON 2 avenue Barthélemy Thimonnier F-69300 Caluire / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matas Gabalda, Carlos 56 rue Georges Sand F-07500 Granges Les Valence / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/52] | Laurent, Michel Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420178.9 | 23.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880008562 | 21.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8808562 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348306 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/28 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
D02G3/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1989/52] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Kablieren von Fäden | [1989/52] | English: | Machine for cabling threads | [1989/52] | French: | Machine de câblage de fils | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/34] | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0165188 ; | [A]FR1175229 |