EP0348316 - Device with an electric, annular, insulated coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE POUR L'APPLICATION DE L'OPTIQUE ET DE L'ELECTRONIQUE A LA RECHERCHE ET A L'AUTOMATISATION OPTELEC (SOCIETE ANONYME) Chemin de la Charrette - Z.I 73200 Albertville / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states SOCIETE POUR L'APPLICATION DE L'OPTIQUE ET DE L'ELECTRONIQUE A LA RECHERCHE ET A L'AUTOMATISATION OPTELEC (SOCIETE ANONYME) Chemin de la Charrette - Z.I F-73200 Albertville / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chappel, Bernard 1032, chemin des Trois Poiriers F-73200 Albertville / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | de Beaumont, Michel Cabinet Poncet 7, chemin de Tillier B.P. 317 F-74008 Annecy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420226.6 | 22.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880008982 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8808982 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348316 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01F31/00 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
H01F30/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen mit isolierter elektrischer ringförmiger Windung | [1989/52] | English: | Device with an electric, annular, insulated coil | [1989/52] | French: | Dispositif à enroulement électrique torique isolé | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/24] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/29] | 22.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4639707 ; | [A]EP0070783 ; | [AP]EP0298878 ; | [A]GB2026251 |