EP0354138 - Process for preparing diorganopolysiloxanes containing terminal alkoxy groups [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frances, Jean-Marc 9, avenue Condorcet F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Peccoux, Pierre-Michel 71, rue Louis-Gorjus F-69004 Lyon / FR | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [2008/32] |
Former [1991/51] | Fabre, Madeleine-France, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Direction des Brevets Secteur Spécialités Chimiques 25, quai Paul-Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1990/06] | Seugnet, Jean Louis RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420273.8 | 25.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | FR19880010538 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: FR 8810538 | [1990/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354138 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/18, C08G77/08, C08L83/04 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C08G77/08 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von endständigen, Alkoxygruppen enthaltenden Diorganopolysiloxanen | [1990/06] | English: | Process for preparing diorganopolysiloxanes containing terminal alkoxy groups | [1990/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation de diorganopolysiloxanes à groupements terminaux alcoxy | [1990/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/04] | 05.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2311817 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]GB2079745 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US4460739 (ASHBY BRUCE A [US]); | [A]US4680364 (LUCAS GARY M [US]) |