EP0356351 - Electronic camera with proofing feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Cynthia Sue c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Parent, Yves, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Parent, Yves, et al Kodak-Pathé Département Brevets et Licences Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420300.9 | 10.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880234788 | 22.08.1988 Original published format: US 234788 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356351 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356351 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76, H04N5/907 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
H04N1/00392 (EP,US);
H04N1/00411 (EP,US);
H04N1/0044 (EP,US);
H04N1/00442 (EP,US);
H04N1/00453 (EP,US);
H04N1/00461 (EP,US);
H04N1/2137 (EP,US);
H04N1/2158 (EP,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0041 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0049 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0082 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/09] | Title | German: | Elektronische Kamera mit Prüfvorrichtung | [1990/09] | English: | Electronic camera with proofing feature | [1990/09] | French: | Caméra électronique avec dispositif de vérification | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4262301 (ERLICHMAN IRVING); | [A]US4604668 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]); | [A]US4714962 (LEVINE ALFRED B [US]) |