EP0363285 - Easy to open aluminium protective capsule, and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE 16, boulevard du Général Leclerc 92115 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE ALIMENTAIRE 16, boulevard du Général Leclerc F-92115 Clichy / FR | ||
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states CEBAL 98, boulevard Victor Hugo F-92115 Clichy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Druesne, Guy Saint-Sauveur de Puynormand F-33660 Saint-Seurin-Sur-l'Isle / FR | 02 /
Michaud, Joel 57 avenue Jean Moulin F-24700 Montpon Menestrol / FR | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420323.1 | 05.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | FR19880012059 | 07.09.1988 Original published format: FR 8812059 | [1990/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0363285 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0363285 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/62, B21D51/44 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
B21D51/44 (EP,US);
B65D41/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Leicht zu öffnende Flaschenkapsel aus Aluminiumfolie sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/15] | English: | Easy to open aluminium protective capsule, and process for its manufacture | [1990/15] | French: | Capsule de surbouchage en aluminium à découpage facile et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.09.1993 | GR | 01.09.1993 | NL | 01.09.1993 | SE | 01.09.1993 | BE | 30.09.1993 | CH | 30.09.1993 | LI | 30.09.1993 | LU | 30.09.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/48] | GB | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
BE | 30.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | GB | 01.09.1993 | |
NL | 01.09.1993 | ||
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | NL | 01.09.1993 | |
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | NL | 01.09.1993 | |
SE | 01.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 01.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB502847 (ALUMINUM CO OF AMERICA); | [A]FR2330603 (MAILLAC STE FERMIERE CHATEAU [FR]); | [A]CA1136579 (BROWNS IRWIN) | Examination | FR2548164 |