EP0375567 - Rim brake pad for bicycles and similar vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.1992 [1992/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SACHS INDUSTRIES Rue de la Briquetterie 80210 Chepy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states SACHS INDUSTRIES Rue de la Briquetterie F-80210 Chepy / FR | ||
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS LAUZIER 12 Route de Saint Jean F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu Isère / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lauzier, René Ruy F-38300 Bourgoin Jallieu / FR | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1990/26] | Bratel, Gérard Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 89420455.1 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | FR19880017620 | 19.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8817620 | [1990/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375567 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62L1/00 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B62L1/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Felgenbremsbacke für Fahrräder und ähnliche Fahrzeuge | [1990/26] | English: | Rim brake pad for bicycles and similar vehicles | [1990/26] | French: | Patin de frein sur jante pour cycles et véhicules similaires | [1990/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/49] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2495563 ; | [A]FR2405175 ; | [A]FR1000330 ; | [A]GB681820 |