EP0379825 - Cellular-type floor frame, side panels or rear panel, system for automatic opening and closing of the body, adaptable for utility vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maysonnave, J.P. 953, avenue Alfred Decugis F-83400 Hyères / FR | [1990/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/31] | Application number, filing date | 89430035.9 | 28.11.1989 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | deleted | [1991/13] |
Former [1990/31] | deleted | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379825 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379825 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/00, B62D33/02 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
B62D21/02 (EP);
B62D33/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/14] |
Former [1990/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Zellenförmiger Bodenrahmen, Seitenwände oder hintere Bordwand, System zum automatischen Öffnen und Schliessen des Wagenkastens, für Nutzfahrzeuge anpassbar | [1990/31] | English: | Cellular-type floor frame, side panels or rear panel, system for automatic opening and closing of the body, adaptable for utility vehicle | [1990/31] | French: | Cadre plancher de type cellulaire ridelles ou hayon système de fermeture ou d'ouverture automatique au bennage adaptable sur véhicule utilitaires | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.12.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU | 09.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 20.10.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 06.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/44] | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.04.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR951980 ; | [Y]DE681045 ; | [Y]DE1025737 ; | [A]FR2406560 ; | [A]DE3008428 |