EP0348323 - Opening/closing device with limited penetration for a pliable plastic sachet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE GENERALE DES EAUX MINERALES DE VITTEL Avenue des Thermes F-88800 Vittel (Vosges) / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states SOCIETE GENERALE DES EAUX MINERALES DE VITTEL Avenue des Thermes F-88800 Vittel (Vosges) / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatourel, Daniel 152 rue de la Forêt F-88800 Vittel / FR | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/26] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1989/52] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 89470009.5 | 03.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | FR19880008568 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: FR 8808568 | [1989/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348323 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348323 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
B65D77/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Öffnen und Verschliessen eines Beutels aus Kunststoff mit beschränktem Eindringungsvermögen | [1989/52] | English: | Opening/closing device with limited penetration for a pliable plastic sachet | [1989/52] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture-fermeture pour sachet en matière synthétique souple avec limitation de pénétration | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Request for further processing for: | 27.05.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1104359 (KATHLEEN HENFREY); | [Y]WO8000556 (TEICH AG FOLIENWALZWERK [AT], et al) |