Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] |
25.03.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] |
21.10.1992 | First examination report | |
04.10.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.1990 [1990/47] |
07.04.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.05.1990 [1990/21] |