EP0369919 - Circuit board with self-supporting connection between sides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christiansen, Robert Arnold 1490 Brown Road Salvisa Kentucky 40372 / US | 02 /
DiGirolamo, Joel Alan 2686 Sussex Drive Lexington Kentucky 40510 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | de Pena, Alain, et al Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [1990/21] | Bonin, Jean-Jacques Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 89480159.6 | 10.10.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | US19880271242 | 14.11.1988 Original published format: US 271242 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369919 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369919 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/32, H05K1/18, H05K3/40 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L25/16 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H05K3/222 (EP,US);
H05K3/328 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6611 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05647 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45124 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48747 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49111 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78313 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0394 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09472 (EP,US);
H05K2201/096 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10363 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10477 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10553 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0285 (EP,US);
H05K2203/049 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45124, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48472, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48747, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49111, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/21] | Title | German: | Leiterplatten mit selbsttragender Verbindung zwischen den Seiten | [1990/21] | English: | Circuit board with self-supporting connection between sides | [1990/21] | French: | Panneau à circuit avec connexion auto portante entre les faces | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1150530 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB]); | [AD]US3977074 (FURNIVAL THOMAS J); | [A]GB2135521 (FERRANTI PLC); | [A]FR2548857 (CORTAILLOD CABLES SA [CH]); | [A]GB2153595 (O KEY PRINTED WIRING CO LTD); | [A]WO8805428 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) |