EP0344086 - Pneumatic tire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carolla, Russell Anthony 318 Patterson Avenue Akron Ohio 44310 / US | 02 /
Gammon, Nathan Allen 44 Lakefront Drive Akron Ohio 44319 / US | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1990/51] |
Former [1989/48] | Weyland, J.J. Pierre Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 89630089.4 | 05.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19880197524 | 23.05.1988 Original published format: US 197524 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344086 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344086 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344086 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/00, B60C9/06, B60C9/09 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
B60C15/0045 (EP,US);
B60C9/09 (EP,US);
B60C9/26 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10864 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/48] | Title | German: | Luftreifen | [1989/48] | English: | Pneumatic tire | [1989/48] | French: | Bandage pneumatique | [1989/48] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 29.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2102746 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2344115 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER); | [A]FR2347214 (PIRELLI [IT]) |