EP0369931 - Methods for forming macrocomposite bodies and macrocomposite bodies produced thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newkirk, Marc Stevens 38 Quartz Mill Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Christopher Robin 17 Welwyn Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
Aghajanian, Michael Kevork 604 Helmsdale Court Bel Air Maryland 21014 / US | 04 /
White, Danny Ray 5 Hillcrest Lane Elkton Maryland 21921 / US | 05 /
Nagelberg, Alan Scott 5521 E. Timberview Court Wilmington Delaware 19808 / US | 06 /
Wiener, Robert James 804 Branch Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/21] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89630179.3 | 28.09.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | US19880269464 | 10.11.1988 Original published format: US 269464 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369931 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369931 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/09, C22C1/10, B22F3/26 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C22C1/1015 (EP,US);
C22C47/00 (KR);
B22D19/14 (KR);
C22C1/1036 (EP,US);
C22C1/1063 (EP,US);
C22C47/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Formen von Makro-Verbundwerkstoff-Körpern und Makroprodukte daraus | [1990/21] | English: | Methods for forming macrocomposite bodies and macrocomposite bodies produced thereby | [1990/21] | French: | Procédé pour la production de corps macrocomposites et les corps macrocomposites ainsi obtenus | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 18.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.1994 | ES | 30.11.1994 | GR | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | SE | 28.02.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
GR | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60177102 ; | [X]DE2166925 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]EP0075648 (OSAKA DIAMOND IND [JP]); | [X]US4570316 (SAKAMAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [X]US4710223 (MATEJCZYK DANIEL E [US]); | [X]EP0250210 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 18 (M-448)[2075], 24th January 1986; & JP-A-60 177 102 (MAZDA K.K.), & JP60177102 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0324706 | EP0365978 |