EP0370943 - System for telemetering data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giora, Harel Haveradim Street 26 Givat Avia Yehud / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states Giora, Harel Haveradim Street 26 Givat Avia Yehud / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 89630206.4 | 16.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | IL19430000884 | 22.11.1988 Original published format: IL 88443 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370943 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370943 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, G01R22/00 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
G01R22/00 (EP,US);
H02J13/00009 (US);
H02J13/0001 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (US);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S10/52 (EP);
Y04S40/121 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung von Telemetriedaten | [1990/22] | English: | System for telemetering data | [1990/22] | French: | Système de transmission de données de télémesure | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/42] | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.03.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5392155 ; | [A]JPS5724132 ; | [A]JPS57162536 ; | [A]FR2469055 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]US4446458 (COOK DONALD [US]); | [A]US4563679 (ARAI YUKIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4633218 (PALSGROVE BOYD H [US], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN & JP-A-53 92155 (TOKYO DENRYOKU K.K.) 08 December 1978, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 91 (E-109)(969) 28 May 1982& JP-A-57 24132 (SHARP K.K.) 08 February 1982, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 4 (E-151)(1149) 08 January 1983& JP-A-57 162536 (TOUSHIBA DENZAI K.K.) 06 October 1982, |