EP0346267 - Tube-drawing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERLINER WASSER-BETRIEBE EIGENBETRIEB VON BERLIN Postfach 31 01 80 10631 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states BERLINER WASSER-BETRIEBE EIGENBETRIEB VON BERLIN Postfach 31 01 80 D-10631 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Dietmar Hechelstrasse 24 D-1000 Berlin 51 / DE | 02 /
Gaebelein, Wilhelm, Dr. Niklasstrasse 53 D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE | 03 /
König, Karl-Heinz Walldürner Weg 36 D-1000 Berlin 20 / DE | 04 /
Beyer, Klaus, Dr. Nassauische Strasse 64 D-1000 Berlin 31 / DE | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Maikowski, Michael Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Maikowski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730068.7 | 14.03.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | DE19883819820 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: DE 3819820 | [1989/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346267 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346267 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L1/028, E02D9/02, E03B1/00, H02G1/08 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
B25B27/026 (EP);
B23P19/022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/50] | F16L1/02, E02D9/02, E03B1/00, H02G1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Rohrziehgerät | [1989/50] | English: | Tube-drawing device | [1989/50] | French: | Appareil à étirer les tubes | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2040449 ; | [A]DE2336302 (STEHMEYER & BISCHOFF); | [A]DE1634622 |