EP0338967 - Apparatus for treating slurry by gas-liquid contact method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onizuka, Masakazu c/o Hiroshima Techn. Institute Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK 6-22 Kanonshin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima Hiroshima Pref. / JP | 02 /
Tatani, Atsushi c/o Hiroshima Techn. Institute Mitsubishi Jukogyo KK 6-22 Kanonshin-machi 4-chome Nishi-ku Hiroshima Hiroshima Pref. / JP | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1989/43] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730090.1 | 03.04.1989 | [1989/43] | Priority number, date | JP19880085324 | 08.04.1988 Original published format: JP 8532488 | [1989/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0338967 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338967 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34, B01F3/04 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
B01D53/504 (EP,US);
B01F23/2331 (EP,US);
B01F23/23364 (EP,US);
B01F23/2368 (EP,US);
C01F11/464 (EP,US);
C02F3/205 (EP,US);
B01F27/112 (EP,US);
B01F27/115 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Aufschlämmung mittels Gas-Flüssigkeits-Kontaktverfahren | [1994/27] | English: | Apparatus for treating slurry by gas-liquid contact method | [1989/43] | French: | Appareil pour traiter une bouillie par la méthode de contact gaz-liquide | [1989/43] |
Former [1989/43] | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Brei durch das Gas-Flüssigkeit-Kontaktverfahren | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 16.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0246180 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2158620 (SOPREBA); | [A]DE2135531 (VALMET OY); | [A]DE1244121 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH); | [A]FR2405090 (GROTZ WILHELM [DE]) |