EP0346268 - Function control valve for a compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/50] | Capacity control valve for a compressor | ||
[1995/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itahana, Tsutomu Nagoya Techn. Inst. MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kanno, Hideo Nagoya Techn. Inst. MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Ono, Tetsuo Nagoya Techn. Inst. MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Furuta, Futoru Nagoya Techn. Inst. MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya Aichi Pref. / JP | 05 /
Kobayashi, Susumu Air-Cond. & Refrig. Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Asahi-cho 3-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi / JP | 06 /
Akimoto, Ryosaku Air-Cond. & Refrig. Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Asahi-cho 3-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi / JP | 07 /
Tanigaki, Ryuhei Air-Cond. & Refrig. Mach. Works MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO K.K. 1, Aza-Asahi-cho 3-chome Nishibiwajima-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi / JP | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 D-14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1989/50] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 89730131.3 | 29.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | JP19880076433 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: JP 7643388 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346268 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346268 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
F04B49/24 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/50] | Title | German: | Funktionsregelventil für einen Verdichter | [1995/03] | English: | Function control valve for a compressor | [1995/03] | French: | Clapet de contrôle de fonction pour un compresseur | [1995/03] |
Former [1989/50] | Kapazitätsregelventil für einen Verdichter | ||
Former [1989/50] | Capacity control valve for a compressor | ||
Former [1989/50] | Clapet de contrôle de capacité pour un compresseur | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1258269 ; | [A]DE3622059 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) |