Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE101995T | 15.03.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP89730225 | 20.12.1989 | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0375599 | Global Dossier | 02.03.1994 | B1 | EP0375599 | 02.05.1991 | A3 | EP0375599 | 27.06.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2006594 | 24.08.1999 | C | CA2006594 | 23.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3844157 | 28.06.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58907100D1 | 07.04.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2049840T | 01.05.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2933656B | 16.08.1999 | B2 | JPH02246969 | 02.10.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5152798 | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3844157 | 23.12.1988 |