Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0341206 | Global Dossier | 08.11.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8902102 | 05.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0249069 | 19.02.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR900018185 | 20.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX15927A | 01.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5023274 | 11.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CH168888 | 05.05.1988 |