EP0344123 - Reduced-yolk egg product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For:CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maly, Eugene R. 10866 101st Place Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US | 02 /
Olson, Pauline M. 906 Sudberry Lane Egan Minnesota 55123 / US | 03 /
Yang, Jason H. 2420 Olive Lane Plymouth Minnesota 55447 / US | [1989/48] | Application number, filing date | 89810386.6 | 24.05.1989 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19880199567 | 27.05.1988 Original published format: US 199567 | US19880263668 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: US 263668 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0344123 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0344123 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/32, A23B5/00 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
A23L15/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/48] | A23L1/32 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Eiprodukt mit vermindertem Eigelbgehalt | [1989/48] | English: | Reduced-yolk egg product | [1989/48] | French: | Produit à base d'oeuf avec une teneur réduite en jaune d'oeuf | [1989/48] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 18.01.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3843811 ; | [Y]US4296134 ; | [A]GB1216642 ; | [A]US4200663 ; | [A]US3711299 (ZIEGLER H); | [A]US3615705 |