EP0345222 - Grating and support frame therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-Bauelemente AG Webereistrasse 47 8134 Adliswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states Poly-Bauelemente AG Webereistrasse 47 CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomann, Roland A. Hehlstrasse 6 CH-8135 Langnau / CH | 02 /
Witschi, Heinz Am Luzerbach 9 CH-6043 Adligenswil / CH | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Schick, Carl, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Schick, Carl, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1989/49] | Schick, Carl, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Patentanwälte Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89810394.0 | 26.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | CH19880002075 | 01.06.1988 Original published format: CH 207588 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345222 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345222 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/06, E02D29/14 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP);
E03F5/06 (EP);
E03F2005/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Gitterrost und Tragrahmen dazu | [1989/49] | English: | Grating and support frame therefor | [1989/49] | French: | Grille et son encadrement | [1989/49] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/35] | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/35] | Appeal following examination | 13.12.1995 | Appeal received No. T0319/96 | 11.01.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.12.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2456169 ; | [A]DE8717057U ; | [A]DE3016465 |