blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0345223

EP0345223 - Apparatus for chopping food [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOHA Moderne Haushaltwaren AG
Tannholzstrasse 14
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]For all designated states
MOHA MODERNE HAUSHALTWAREN AG
Tannholzstrasse 14
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Michel, Walter
Alpenblickstrasse 8
CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH
[1989/49]
Representative(s)Kerr, Andrew
Postfach 444 Finkelerweg 44
4144 Arlesheim / CH
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Kerr, Andrew
Postfach 444 Finkelerweg 44
CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH
Application number, filing date89810395.729.05.1989
[1989/49]
Priority number, dateCH1988000213303.06.1988         Original published format: CH 213388
[1989/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0345223
Date:06.12.1989
Language:DE
[1989/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0345223
Date:02.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:B26D3/26
[1989/49]
CPC:
B26D3/26 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/49]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Zerkleinern von Nahrungsmitteln[1989/49]
English:Apparatus for chopping food[1989/49]
French:Appareil pour découper des produits alimentaires[1989/49]
Examination procedure05.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/14]
11.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.04.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.1994Fee for grant paid
27.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination07.12.1992Appeal received
03.02.1993Statement of grounds filed
16.03.1993Interlocutory revision of appeal
Opposition(s)03.08.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43]
Request for further processing for:12.07.1993Request for further processing filed
12.07.1993Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.08.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
10.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR02.11.1994
SE02.02.1995
[2000/04]
Former [1996/03]SE02.02.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US2140010  (LUDWIG HANEL CHARLES);
 [A]GB821493  (POPEIL SAMUEL J);
 [A]DE2651568  (GERDES GMBH)
ExaminationDE2719980
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.