EP0346278 - Seed-moistening machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCracken, Alan Tellerweg 30 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | [1989/50] | Application number, filing date | 89810398.1 | 29.05.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | CH19880002140 | 06.06.1988 Original published format: CH 214088 | [1989/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346278 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346278 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A01C1/06, B02B1/06 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
B02B1/06 (EP,US);
A01C1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Benetzen von Saatgut | [1989/50] | English: | Seed-moistening machine | [1989/50] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de semences | [1989/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 21.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB480203 (BERTIE NORMAN RODDA); | [AD]US3155542 (CORDELL RAY R, et al); | [A]CH487673 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]); | [A]FR2297791 (RANKS HOVIS MCDOUGALL LTD [GB]); | [AD]DE3239867 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) |