EP0354175 - Installation for controlling a plurality of electrical receivers susceptible to occupy at least two states [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOMFY 8, rue de Margencel F-74300 Cluses / FR | [1990/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacquel, Dominique Ternier Thyez F-74300 Cluses / FR | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Meylan, Robert Maurice, et al c/o BUGNION S.A. 10, route de Florissant Case Postale 375 CH-1211 Genève 12 - Champel / CH | Application number, filing date | 89810537.4 | 14.07.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | FR19880010282 | 29.07.1988 Original published format: FR 8810282 | [1990/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0354175 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0354175 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G08C25/00, E06B9/68 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
E06B9/70 (EP,US);
G05B11/18 (KR);
G08C25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/06] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Steuerung von einer Vielzahl elektrischer Empfänger, geeignet zum Annehmen von mindestens zwei Zuständen | [1990/06] | English: | Installation for controlling a plurality of electrical receivers susceptible to occupy at least two states | [1990/06] | French: | Installation de commande de plusieurs récepteurs électriques susceptibles d'occuper au moins deux états | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 11.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH611969 (LYSS SELECTRON AG [CH]); | [AD]FR2510777 (CARPANO & PONS [FR]) |