EP0356384 - Recycling of sulfuric-acid waste with the aid of a biological process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stucki, Gerhard, Dr. Egghof CH-4466 Ormalingen / CH | 02 /
Hüper, Heinz Auf Käppelimatt 23 CH-4133 Pratteln / CH | [1990/09] | Application number, filing date | 89810581.2 | 28.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | CH19880003031 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: CH 303188 | [1990/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356384 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356384 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12P3/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C01B17/164 (EP);
C01B17/0404 (EP);
C01B17/22 (EP);
C12P3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | C01B17/69, C12P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Wiederverwertung von Abfallschwefelsäure mit Hilfe biologischer Verfahren | [1990/09] | English: | Recycling of sulfuric-acid waste with the aid of a biological process | [1990/09] | French: | Recyclage de déchets de l'acide sulfurique à l'aide d'un procédé biologique | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 12.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/36] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2548213 ; | [A]CH216408 ; | [A]GB1245759 |