EP0371919 - Sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEFINA S.A. 82 Rue de Lausanne CH-1701 Fribourg / CH | [1995/33] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states MEFINA SA 5A, boulevard de Pérolles CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jimenez, Antonio 19, rue de la Prulay CH-1217 Meyrin / CH | 02 /
Combepine, Michel 9, rue François Durafour CH-1220 Les Avanchets / CH | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/30] |
Former [1990/23] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 89810881.6 | 17.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | CH19880004438 | 30.11.1988 Original published format: CH 443888 | [1990/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0371919 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D05B51/00, D05B75/00 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
D05B51/00 (EP,US);
D05B69/00 (KR);
D05B73/00 (EP,US);
D05B43/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | Nähmaschine | [1990/23] | English: | Sewing machine | [1990/23] | French: | Machine à coudre | [1990/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/50] | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0204426 (MARUZEN SEWING MACHINE [JP]); | [A]US1938018 (H DOUBLER CHARLES W); | [A]US2656805 (CHARLES BEINHOLD) |