EP0335839 - Mechanical device for the self-recording of the end of stroke slider, when motorised shutters are being raised [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAPOSA S.r.l. Via Pompeiana, 220 I-63023 Fermo (AP) / IT | [1989/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Postacchini, Dante Via Puccini, 17 I-63023 Fermo (AP) / IT | [1989/40] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/40] | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 I-60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830060.3 | 17.02.1989 | [1989/40] | Priority number, date | IT19880000609 | 31.03.1988 Original published format: IT 60988 | [1989/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0335839 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0335839 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0335839 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/68 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
E06B9/88 (EP);
E06B2009/6881 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/40] | E06B9/204 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/40] | Title | German: | Mechanische Vorrichtung zur Selbsteinstellung des Endanschlagschiebers beim Anheben von motorisierten Läden | [1993/20] | English: | Mechanical device for the self-recording of the end of stroke slider, when motorised shutters are being raised | [1989/40] | French: | Dispositif mécanique pour l'auto-enregistrement du coulisseau de butée de fin de course, lors du levage des volets motorisés | [1993/20] |
Former [1989/40] | Mechanische Vorrichtung zur Selbstregistrierung des Endes vom Anschlagschieber beim Anheben von motorisierten Läden | ||
Former [1989/40] | Dispositif mécanique pour l' auto-enregistrement de fin de coulisseau à butée en sous levant des volets motorisés | Examination procedure | 08.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.1994 | SE | 18.02.1994 | [1995/29] |
Former [1994/49] | SE | 18.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2849512 (SIMU SOCIETE IND DU METAL USIN); | [A]DE3003636 (BECKER EMIL & ADOLF GMBH CO [DE]) |