EP0399132 - Automatic teat-washer for cows or other milk-producing animals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/48] | Automatic teat-washer for cows or other milk animals | ||
[1994/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILNA CORPORATION N.V. c/o Tarma Trust Management N.V., Polaris Weg 35 Curaçao / AN | [1993/01] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states Bodini, Francesco Piazza Cadorna, 2 I-26100 Cremona / IT | ||
For all designated states Bottazzi, Vittorio Via Verdi, 1 I-43010 Polesine Parmense (PR) / IT | |||
For all designated states Battistotti, Bruno Viale Risorgimento, 33/b I-29100 Piacenza / IT | |||
For all designated states Soavi, Adriano Via Mario da Erba, 29/a I-43100 Parma / IT | |||
For all designated states Rossi, Gabriele Via S. Martino, 1 I-26015 Soresina (CR) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodini, Francesco Via Cadorna 2 I-26100 Cremona / IT | 02 /
Bottazzi, Vittorio Via Verdi 1 I-Polesine Parmense(PR) / IT | 03 /
Battistotti, Bruno Viale Risorgimento 33/b I-29100 Piacenza / IT | 04 /
Soavi, Adriano Via Mario da Erba 29/a I-43100 Parma / IT | 05 /
Rossi, Gabriele Via S. Martino 1 I-26015 Soresina (CR) / IT | [1992/50] |
Former [1990/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Perani, Aurelio c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1990/48] | Dr. Ing. A. Racheli & C. S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 I-20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830236.9 | 25.05.1989 | [1990/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399132 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399132 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01K13/00, A01J7/00 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
A01J7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Automatische Zitzenreinigungsvorrichtung für Kühe oder andere Milchtiere | [1990/48] | English: | Automatic teat-washer for cows or other milk-producing animals | [1994/11] | French: | Dispositif automatique pour laver les trayons d'une vache ou autres animaux laitiers | [1990/48] |
Former [1990/48] | Automatic teat-washer for cows or other milk animals | Examination procedure | 02.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.07.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   02.07.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2559351 (MARQUAIRE PIERRE [FR]); | [A]WO8900378 (TAITTOMETALLI OY [FI]) |