Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] |
29.10.1991 | First examination report | |
27.07.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] |
10.02.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] |