EP0360763 - Chair with a pivoting backrest restrained by an adjustable spring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CO.FE.MO. S.p.A. 26, Via Cavezzo 25045 Castegnato (Brescia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states CO.FE.MO S.p.A. 26, Via Cavezzo I-25045 Castegnato (Brescia) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moreschi, Sergio 26, Via Cavezzo I-25045 Castegnato (Brescia) / IT | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 I-25121 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830377.1 | 05.09.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | IT19880007070U | 09.09.1988 Original published format: IT 707088 U | [1990/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360763 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/44 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
A47C7/441 (EP);
A47C7/443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT [1990/13] | Title | German: | Stuhl mit schwingbarer und durch eine einstellbare Feder zurückgehaltener Lehne | [1990/13] | English: | Chair with a pivoting backrest restrained by an adjustable spring | [1990/13] | French: | Chaise avec dossier oscillant contrasté par un ressort réglable | [1990/13] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/38] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2579918 (FREEMAN ROLAND J); | [Y]US3027191 (FINN LIE); | [X]GB1203783 (G K N SANKEY LTD FORMERLY JOSE); | [A]US4711491 (GINAT JONATHAN [US]) |