EP0401457 - Textile fibre bale breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Durante, 1 I-25036 Palazzolo sull'Oglio Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Durante, 1 I-25036 Palazzolo sull'Oglio Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi Marzoli, Pietro FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
Mascheretti, Mario FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830434.0 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | IT19890020724 | 01.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2072489 | [1990/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401457 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401457 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D01G7/10 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
D01G7/12 (EP,US);
D01G5/00 (KR);
D01G7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/50] | Title | German: | Textilfaserballenöffner | [1990/50] | English: | Textile fibre bale breaker | [1990/50] | French: | Ouvreuse de balles de fibres textiles | [1990/50] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH353286 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]); | [Y]DE1245815 (SCHUBERT & SALZER MASCHINEN); | [AD]DE1267151 ; | [A]US4479285 (RAGAN EDDIE D [US]) |