EP0400260 - Apparatus for driving the spindles in a ring spinning machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Durante, 1 I-25036 Palazzolo sull'Oglio Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Durante, 1 I-25036 Palazzolo sull'Oglio Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi Marzoli, Pietro FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.P.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
Cossandi, Santino FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.P.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | [1997/15] |
Former [1990/49] | 01 /
Bianchi, Marzoli, Pietro FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.P.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | ||
02 /
Cossandi, Santino FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.P.A. I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | Representative(s) | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830440.7 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | IT19890020725 | 01.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2072589 | [1990/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0400260 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0400260 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400260 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D01H1/241 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
D01H1/241 (EP);
D01H1/243 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1990/49] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Antrieb der Spindeln einer Ringspinnmaschine | [1990/49] | English: | Apparatus for driving the spindles in a ring spinning machine | [1990/49] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement des broches dans un métier à filer à anneaux | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.05.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3645084 (NIMTZ KLAUS); | [A]DE7344757U ; | [Y]DE8536632U |