EP0366620 - A circuit for controlling a direct-current motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARELLI AUTRONICA S.p.A. Piazza Sant'Ambrogio, 6 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states MARELLI AUTRONICA S.p.A. Piazza Sant'Ambrogio, 6 I-20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calfus, Marco Strada Superga 298 I-10132 Torino / IT | 02 /
Pautasso, Luciano Via Torino, 213 I-10042 Nichelino (Torino) / IT | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830450.6 | 17.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | IT19880067955 | 25.10.1988 Original published format: IT 6795588 | [1990/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366620 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10, H02P8/00 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
H02P8/22 (EP);
F02D11/10 (EP);
F02D2011/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Kreis zur Steuerung eines Motors für Gleichstrom | [1990/18] | English: | A circuit for controlling a direct-current motor | [1990/18] | French: | Circuit pour la commande d'un moteur à courant continu | [1990/18] | File destroyed: | 05.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 03.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/25] | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2385553 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | [A]FR2549899 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]US4508078 (TAKEUCHI NOBUO [JP], et al); | [A]US4523565 (OMITSU TAKASHI [US]); | [A]FR2569231 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4612615 (MURAKAMI TERUKIYO [JP]); | [Y]US4641622 (MURAKAMI TERUKIYO [JP]); | [Y]US4765295 (ISHIKAWA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al); | [A]EP0285868 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |