EP0370972 - Web embossing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano 55100 Lucca / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states FABIO PERINI S.p.A. Via per Mugnano I-55100 Lucca / IT | ||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states PERINI NAVI S.p.A. Viale Carducci, 427 I-55100 Lucca / IT | ||
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states PERINI FINANZIARIA S.p.A. Viale Carducci, 427 I-55100 Lucca / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biagiotti, Guglielmo Via di Vorno No.105 Vorno Capannori Lucca / IT | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Gianfranco Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Mannucci, Gianfranco, Dott.-Ing. Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 I-50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 89830507.3 | 17.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | IT19880009529 | 23.11.1988 Original published format: IT 952988 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0370972 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370972 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0370972 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP,KR,US);
B31F2201/0735 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0738 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0766 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0782 (EP,US);
B31F2201/0787 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/22] | Title | German: | Bandprägemaschine | [1990/22] | English: | Web embossing machine | [1990/22] | French: | Machine d'estampage de bandes | [1990/22] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.1993
23.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE KAYSERSBERG S.A. Route de Lapoutroie F-68240 Kaysersberg / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG Service Propriété Industrielle 2 rue du Geisbourg 68240 Kayersberg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.1993
23.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE KAYSERSBERG S.A. Route de Lapoutroie F-68240 Kaysersberg / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG, Service Propriété Industrielle, 2 rue du Geisbourg 68240 Kayersberg / FR | ||
Former [1993/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.08.1993
23.08.1993
ADMISSIBLE KAYSERSBERG S.A. Route de Lapoutroie F-68240 Kaysersberg / FR Opponent's representative David, Daniel KAYSERSBERG Service Propriété Industrielle 23 boulevard Georges Clemenceau F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | 14.09.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.01.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1994 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.03.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.04.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.05.1997 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.11.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.04.1996 | Appeal received No. T0358/96 | 12.08.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.05.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 27.05.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3738905 (THOMAS G); | [A]US4307141 (WALBRUN LAWRENCE A); | [A]US4326002 (SCHULZ GALYN A); | [X]US4483728 (BAUERNFEIND ROBERT N [US]); | [X]US4659608 (SCHULZ GALYN A [US]); | [A]EP0265298 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]) |