EP0342176 - Fluid distribution system for a variable-crown roll and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/46] | Fluid distribution system for a variable-crown roll | ||
[1996/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALMET CORPORATION Panuntie 6 00620 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states VALMET CORPORATION Panuntie 6 00620 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [1989/46] | For all designated states VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC. Punanotkonkatu 2 SF-00130 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niskanen, Juhani Päijättie 3 B 10 SF-40950 Muurame / FI | [1989/46] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/46] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850153.1 | 10.05.1989 | [1989/46] | Priority number, date | FI19880002214 | 11.05.1988 Original published format: FI 882214 | [1989/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0342176 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0342176 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0342176 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/02, F16C13/00 | [1989/46] | CPC: |
F16C13/028 (EP,US);
D21G1/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/46] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsverteilungssystem für eine Durchbiegungseinstellwalze und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben | [1996/33] | English: | Fluid distribution system for a variable-crown roll and method for producing the same | [1996/33] | French: | Système de distribution du liquide pour un rouleau à réglage de la flexion et son procédé de fabrication | [1996/33] |
Former [1989/46] | Flüssigkeitsverteilungssystem für eine Durchbiegungseinstellwalze | ||
Former [1989/46] | Fluid distribution system for a variable-crown roll | ||
Former [1989/46] | Système de distribution du liquide pour un rouleau à réglage de la flexion | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4035038 (HINCHCLIFFE JOHN CROSSLEY, et al); | [A]FR2368631 (ESCHER WYSS SA [CH]); | [A]DE3526283 (KLEINEWEFERS GMBH [DE]) |