EP0346316 - Fusion protein and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KabiGen AB S-112 87 Stockholm / SE | [1989/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gidlund, Magnus Norrtullsgatan 26 S-113 45 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Lake, Mats Bodalsvägen 39 S-181 36 Lidingö / SE | 03 /
Löwenadler, Björn Karlsholmsvägen 3F S-183 64 Täby / SE | 04 /
Wigzell, Hans Oscar Bäckströmsvägen 11 S-126 54 Hägersten / SE | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Henningsson, Gunnar, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850190.3 | 08.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | SE19880002176 | 10.06.1988 Original published format: SE 8802176 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0346316 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0346316 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, A61K39/21, A61K39/395, C12N5/00, G01N33/569, G01N33/68 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N9/6459 (EP);
C12Y304/21069 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/35 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/50] | Title | German: | Fusionsprotein sowie dessen Verwendung | [1989/50] | English: | Fusion protein and its use | [1989/50] | French: | Protéine fusionnée et son utilisation | [1989/50] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/32] | 06.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219106 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]WO8602077 (MEADE HARRY M, et al) | [A] - NATURE, vol. 329, no. 6134, 3rd - 9th September 1987pages 68-70; S. ADAMS et al.: "The expression of hybrid HIV:Ty virus-like particles in yeast" | [A] - BIO TECHNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 2, February 1986pages 128-133; C.D. CABRADILLA et al.: "Serodiagnosis of antibodies to the human AIDS retrovirus with a bacterially synthesized env polypeptide" |