EP0356408 - A hydraulic steering system for electrically driven motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valvtech AB Junistigen 10 S-931 52 Skelleftea / SE | [1992/17] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states BAHCO HYDRAUTO AB Box 801 S-931 28 Skelleftea / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Bo Junistigen 10 S-931 52 Skelleftea / SE | 02 /
Holmgren, Anders Kadettgatan 22 S-930 30 Ursviken / SE | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850242.2 | 02.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | SE19880002957 | 23.08.1988 Original published format: SE 8802957 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356408 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356408 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/093 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
B62D5/065 (EP,US);
B62D5/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Lenkungssystem für elektrisch angetriebene Fahrzeuge | [1990/09] | English: | A hydraulic steering system for electrically driven motor vehicles | [1990/09] | French: | Système hydraulique de direction pour véhicules à moteur électrique | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/26] | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.08.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5923101 ; | [X]FR1181985 ; | [Y]FR2273753 (BODIN AB MASKIN OVE [SE]); | [Y]GB2056928 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [E]DE3843893 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 116 (M-299)[1553], 20th May 1984; & JP-A-59 23 101 (DIESEL KIKI) 06-02-1984, & JP5923101 A 00000000 |