EP0364424 - A method of locating a print in a respective printing position in multi-colour silk screen printers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1991 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Svecia Silkscreen Maskiner AB Kumla Gardsväg Eriksbergs Industriomrade S-145 81 Norsborg / SE | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ericsson, Sylve Jack Donald Tolléns väg 8 S-147 00 Tumba / SE | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Lindblom, Erik J. Flotthamn 150 23 Enhörna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Lindblom, Erik J Flotthamn 150 23 Enhörna / SE | ||
Former [1990/16] | Lindblom, Erik J. Flotthamn S-150 23 Enhörna / SE | Application number, filing date | 89850335.4 | 09.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | SE19880003585 | 10.10.1988 Original published format: SE 8803585 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364424 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364424 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/10, B41F15/22, B41F33/00 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
B41F15/22 (EP);
B41F15/10 (EP);
B41F33/0009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einstellen eines Aufdrucks in einer entsprechenden Druckstellung in Mehrfarbensiebdruckmaschinen | [1990/16] | English: | A method of locating a print in a respective printing position in multi-colour silk screen printers | [1990/16] | French: | Procédé d'ajustage d'une impression dans une position d'impression respective dans des machines de sérigraphie en plusieurs couleurs | [1990/16] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/50] | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0313531 ; | [YD]US4516495 ; | [X]JPS61123543 ; | [Y]JPS60179256 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 311 (M-528)(2367) 23 October 1986& JP-A-61 123543 (HITACHI LTD) 11 June 1986, | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 21 (M-449)(2078) 28 January 1986& JP-A-60 179256 (TSUJI SENSHIYOKU K.K.) 13 September 1985, |